HI HB924 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies mortgage servicer requirements under chapter 454M, Hawaii Revised Statutes, including licensing requirements, crediting of payments, escrows for payment of taxes and insurance, payoff statements, delinquencies and loss mitigation efforts, borrower complaints, fee disclosures, record maintenance, assignment of servicing rights, and prohibited activities. Establishes bonding requirements.
Title
Mortgage Servicers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1093 (Same As) 2015-06-01 - Act 062, 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=924&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB924_.HTM |