HI HB924 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 098, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 098, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to provide written notice of a hearing to all parties by first class mail at least fifteen days before the scheduled hearing. Makes housekeeping amendments to the law relating to the scope of negotiations between the public employer and the exclusive representative to conform to existing law. (HB924 CD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining; Hawaii Labor Relations Board; Hearing Notice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 098, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 098, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto, Thielen voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 29). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 29) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Hashem Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Johanson. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 544) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1260) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 963) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 53). |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 02-19-13. |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 597) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 95), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1155 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL.