HI HB92 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the ballot of an absentee or military-overseas voter is valid even if the voter becomes ineligible to vote after casting the ballot.
Title
Elections; Absentee Voting; Military-Overseas Voting; Validity of Ballot Cast by Voter Who Becomes Ineligible
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1033) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 141). |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 751), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6). |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 258), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=92&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB92_.HTM |