HI HB919 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the formula for crediting unused sick leave to retirement benefits for public employees who become members of the Employees' Retirement System after June 30, 2015.
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Unused Sick Leave Credit For Public Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1088 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=919&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB919_.HTM |