HI HB917 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from county approval state department of transportation development and construction of highways and airports.
Title
Construction Task Force (2010); Transportation; County Approval Exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. George Fontaine [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from WLO/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516), recommending referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Carroll, Chang, Har, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morita, Riviere; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morita, Riviere; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/EEP on Tuesday, 02-15-11 9:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO/EEP. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 01-31-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to TRN, WLO/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |