HI HB912 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB912
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from lending a firearm to a person who does not have a firearm permit or does not have a registered firearm. Requires an adult who is borrowing a firearm to have either a firearm permit or a registered firearm, and not be prohibited to own or possess a firearm. Specifies that an adult who is twenty-one years of age or older may be lent a rifle or shotgun for a period not to exceed twelve hours. Repeals the authorization to use a rifle or shotgun outside of the State for up to seventy-five days. Repeals the authorization to lend a rifle or shotgun without a permit.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB912 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
SB923 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
SB923 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=912&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB912_.HTM |