HI SB923 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB923

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a person from lending a firearm to a person who does not have a firearm permit or does not have a registered firearm. Requires an adult who is borrowing a firearm to have either a firearm permit or a registered firearm, and not be prohibited to own or possess a firearm. Specifies that an adult who is twenty-one years of age or older may be lent a rifle or shotgun for a period not to exceed twelve hours. Repeals the authorization to use a rifle or shotgun outside of the State for up to seventy-five days. Repeals the authorization to lend a rifle or shotgun without a permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB923 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB912 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback