HI HB903 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB903
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from legislative approval the sale of the leased fee interest in certain affordable leasehold developments by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation.
Title
Relating To Lands Controlled By The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1057 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB903 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB903 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=903&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB903_.HTM |