HI HB903 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or distribution of caffeinated beer beverages labeled as "pre-mixed drinks" in the State. (HB903 HD1)
Title
Intoxicating Liquor; Caffeine; Labeling
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-23-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-08-11 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |