HI HB89 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB89
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 11-357, HRS, to prohibit elected officials as defined in section 11-342(d), HRS, from soliciting and accepting campaign contributions during any regular session or special session of the State Legislature, including any extension of any regular session or special session and any legislative recess day, holiday, or weekend.
Title
Relating To Campaign Contributions By Candidate Committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 5). |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3). |
2023-02-06 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-01 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB89 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Referred to JDC.
SB194 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB194 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Acceptance
Campaign Contributions
Candidate Committees
Hawaii Campaign Spending Commission Package
Solicitation
Campaign Contributions
Candidate Committees
Hawaii Campaign Spending Commission Package
Solicitation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=89&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB89_.HTM |