HI HB889 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB889
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the publicprivate partnership working group and requires an annual report to be submitted to the legislature. Adds public-private partnership project delivery methods and related conditions and requirements to the Hawaii Public Procurement Code. Sunsets the working group on 1/1/2025. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public-private Partnerships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Kanuha, Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 794) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2054) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 4:00PM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1113), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 385) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB889 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 423.