HI HB887 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants highest priority in public procurement to hydrogen fuel cell vehicles. Appropriates moneys for DAGS to upgrade state fleet vehicles. Requires DAGS to submit reports to Legislature. Adds hydrogen fuel cell vehicles to existing incentives for alternative fuel vehicles. (HB887 HD1)
Title
State Fleet Vehicles; Priority for Procurement; Hydrogen Fuel Cell Vehicles; Exemption from Parking Fees and High Occupancy Vehicle Lane Restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-05-15 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-15. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1052 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to EET/GVO/TRE, WAM.