HI HB875 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB875
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for 5 full-time equivalent (5.00 FTE) temporary student intern II positions within the state historic preservation division. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from IAA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1039) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in IAA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Ihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to IAA, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 152). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 933), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 459) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB875 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.