HI HB868 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB868
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to establish trust accounts to provide matching funds to tenants who rent dwelling units. Specifies tenancy termination requirements. Authorizes the issuance of general obligations bonds for capital improvement projects at state low-income housing projects. Appropriates funds. (HB868 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decison-making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 423. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 01-31-17 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB868 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).