HI HB867 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB867
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to submit an application and a petition for federal exemptions for the state authorized use of cannabis in Hawaii from the Drug Enforcement Administration under title 21 Code of Federal Regulations sections 1307.03 and 1308.43.
Title
Relating To Controlled Substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB147 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB867 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB867 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=867&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB867_.HTM |