HI HB862 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the School Readiness Program within the State's Early Learning System. (HB862 HD1)
Title
School Readiness Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cheape. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 02-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1093 (Same As)