HI HB860 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB860
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where a quiet title action involves kuleana land, at the request of any defendant at the time the action was brought, the court shall order: mandatory mediation with a goal of resolving the dispute, including any issues that might need to be preliminarily established through an action commenced under chapter 668A; and consolidation of separate actions commenced by the same plaintiff or multiple plaintiffs for the same real property in interest. Requires the plaintiff in a quiet title action involving kuleana land to bear the costs of required mediation and only recover costs, expenses, or attorney's fees from the defendant as the court may deem equitable under the circumstances. Takes effect 7/1/2035. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Actions For Quiet Title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3510) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 9:20AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Nakamura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 507), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-13 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-02-02 | House | Re-referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 11 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB860 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL.