HI HB853 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB853

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defines official observes. Updates procedures to ensure ballots are properly handled and counted. Promotes fair election process. Provides for places of deposit to be open ten business days prior to election day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB853 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback