HI HB842 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB842
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Environmental Quality Control to establish, implement, and maintain an interactive website available to the public at no cost that provides certain information and notifications regarding environmental assessment and environmental impact statement actions. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Impact Statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 357) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB842 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Environmental Assessments
Environmental Impact Statements
Office of Environmental Quality Control
Public Records
Environmental Assessments
Environmental Impact Statements
Office of Environmental Quality Control
Public Records