HI HB830 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB830
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources State Parks Division to conduct a feasibility study of employing residential caretakers at high-use trails to assist hikers and reduce the need for hiker rescues.
Title
Relating To State Parks.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB830 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1414 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1414 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=830&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB830_.HTM |