HI HB826 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB826
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes unlawful the sale of flavored tobacco products, mislabeling of e-liquid products containing nicotine, and sale of tobacco products other than through retail sales via inperson exchange. Includes e-liquid and electronic smoking devices within the definition of "tobacco products" as used in the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law. Abolishes the Electronic Smoking Device Retailer Registration and Enforcement Unit. Effective 07/01/2060. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Electronic Smoking Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker, Wakai, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 715) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1685) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC deferred the measure until 04-07-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1176) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 76). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kong, LoPresti, McKelvey, Okimoto, Ward, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, B. Kobayashi, D. Kobayashi, Marten voting no (4) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Sayama, Tam; 3 Noes: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 140) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB826 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 329.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Attorney General
Electronic Smoking Device Retailer Registration and Enforcement Unit
Electronic Smoking Devices
Attorney General
Electronic Smoking Device Retailer Registration and Enforcement Unit
Electronic Smoking Devices