HI HB826 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-26 - (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various amendments to the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund law: (1) establishes a tiered system of employer contributions for the medicare part B premiums of new employees who first enter service after 06/30/2011 and subsequently retire, based on their years of service before retirement; (2) when a retired employee is married to an active employee, renders the retired employee ineligible to enroll in a health benefits plan that provides coverage for the active employee; (3) when a retired employee is privately employed and eligible for prepaid health care coverage, renders the retired employee ineligible to enroll in a two-party or family plan that covers the spouse unless the spouse also is enrolled in the prepaid health care plan; (4) requires the auditor to periodically evaluate the health benefits plan for retired employees to determine compliance with the requirements that the plan not duplicate medicare benefits and be secondary to medicare; (5) provides that the employers' contribution for the medicare part B premium shall be based on the least costly medicare part B premium rate and made only for a retired employee; (6) provides medicare part B contributions to a retired employee's spouse only if the employee first entered service before 07/01/2011; (7) requires a retired employee to enroll in both medicare part B and a medical benefits plan of the fund as a condition for receiving reimbursements for medicare part B premiums; (8) requires a retired employee's spouse who is eligible to enroll in the medicare part B medical insurance plan to enroll in that plan as a condition for participating in a health benefits plan of the fund; and (9) requires the annual adjustment of the base monthly contribution for retired employees to be based on the least costly medicare part B premium rate.
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Comprehensive Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=826 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB826_.HTM |