HI HB825 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB825
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Re-Referred to HTH/GVO, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Re-Referred to HTH/GVO, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the Governor's emergency powers to include the authority to assume control, use, or operation of any state facility at no cost or requirement of compensation. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Emergency Powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 141). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:45AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB825 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Re-Referred to HTH/GVO, JDC/WAM.