HI HB823 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:56PM in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a two-year Agricultural Theft Pilot Project in the Department of Agriculture to focus on investigating and prosecuting agricultural theft or agricultural vandalism in the County of Hawaii. Appropriates funds as a grant-in-aid to the office of the prosecuting attorney, county of Hawaii. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural Theft Pilot Project; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:56PM in Conference Room 224.
2015-05-01HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 224.
2015-04-30HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 224.
2015-04-29HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
2015-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
2015-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 3:30PM in conference room 224.
2015-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Keith-Agaran, Riviere Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom.
2015-04-20SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Creagan, Onishi Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Ward.
2015-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
2015-04-16HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2015-04-14HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 578) in amended form (SD 1).
2015-04-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2015-04-10SenateOne Day Notice 04-14-15.
2015-04-10SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1474) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2015-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman.
2015-03-31SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2015-03-27SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2015-03-27SenateReported from AGL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2015-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen.
2015-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-25-15 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2015-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai.
2015-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on AGL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2015-03-10SenateReferred to AGL/JDL, WAM.
2015-03-10SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-03-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 81).
2015-03-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2015-03-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 646), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2015-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2015-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2015-02-19HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
2015-02-19HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 367), recommending referral to FIN.
2015-02-17HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami.
2015-02-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2015-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2015-02-10HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 77) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2015-02-05HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2015-02-04HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2015-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2015-01-28HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2015-01-28HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1199 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to AGL/PSM/JDL, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback