HI HB820 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB820
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where public access is required as a condition of a subdivision, either the county must accept dedication of and maintain the access or identify an entity to own and maintain the access. Authorizes the county to require the subdivider to establish a stewardship fund for maintenance purposes. Takes effect 1/1/2022.
Title
Relating To Public Access.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB820 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB470 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC.
SB470 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=820&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB820_.HTM |