HI HB82 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disallows dividends paid deduction for Real Estate Investment Trusts.
Title
Real Estate Investment Trusts; Dividends Paid Deduction; Disallowed; Income Tax; Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB118 (Same As) 2015-07-15 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 239, 07/14/2015, (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=82&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB82_.HTM |