HI HB818 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB818
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the facts and circumstances to be considered in establishing the offenses of criminal trespass in the second degree and criminal trespass onto state lands may include but not be limited to authenticated photographs, video recordings, or other recordings that show the commission of the offense. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal Trespass Onto State Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 252). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Perruso, Tam, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB818 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JDC.