HI HB813 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the fair treatment law by separating out certain limitations placed on task force members from those placed on legislators. Makes clear that legislators are not prohibited from making statements or taking action in the exercise of their legislative functions. (HB813 HD3)
Title
Ethics Code; Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 215) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Evans, Saiki, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in House conference room 423. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |