HI HB813 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily exempts unemployment compensation from the Hawaii income tax for certain taxpayers.
Title
Unemployment Compensation; Income Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB/LAB on Thursday, 02-03-11 11:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=813 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB813_.HTM |