HI HB808 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB808
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of labor and industrial relations to set workers' compensation medical charges that correspond to the United States Department of Labor Office of Workers' Compensation Programs fee schedule instead of the Medicare Resource Based Relative Value Scale applicable to Hawaii. Requires the department of labor and industrial relations to submit a report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation for analysis of the Act's impact on injured worker's access to treatment. Repeals on 12/31/2024.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB808 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=808&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB808_.HTM |