HI HB805 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 124, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 124, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the employees' retirement system laws to comply with Internal Revenue Code requirements and vesting rules in order to maintain the system's status as a tax-qualified retirement plan. (HB805 CD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Federal Tax Qualification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 124, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 124, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 28). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 28) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Ichiyama, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Hashem Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Johanson. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 528) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1384) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 278). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 898) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-08-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1035 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL, WAM.