HI HB804 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits plaintiffs in medical tort actions to recover the full amount of economic loss. Limits noneconomic damages. Provides guidelines for the award of punitive damages. Permits the introduction of evidence of collateral benefits. Limits the amount of the contingent fee payable to the plaintiff's attorney.
Title
Medical Torts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=804&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB804_.HTM |