HI HB803 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals requirement that $2,000,000 of tax revenues from banks and other financial corporations be deposited into the compliance resolution fund. Effective July 1, 2011. Sunsets on December 31, 2015. (HB803 HD1)
Title
Banks and Other Financial Corporations; Tax Rate Increases
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Solomon. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 168). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Johanson, Riviere voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 12:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Marumoto, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, B. Oshiro, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Luke, Morita, Souki, Ching, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 01-31-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |