HI HB801 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB801
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a retailer from selling or offering for sale combustion engine-powered mopeds beginning January 1, 2023. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Mopeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB308 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB801 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB801 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.