HI SB308 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB308
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a retailer from selling or offering for sale combustion engine-powered mopeds beginning January 1, 2023.
Title
Relating To Mopeds.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRS/CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB801 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB308 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS/CPN, JDC.
SB308 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS/CPN, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=308&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB308_.HTM |