HI HB800 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 78, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Act 78, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation from the Energy Security Special Fund to staff and support the Hawaii Refinery Task Force. (SD2)
Title
Emergency Appropriation; DBEDT; Hawaii Refinery Task Force ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Act 78, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178). |
2013-05-24 | House | Act 078, on 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1178). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 752). |
2013-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Gabbard, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Johanson. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 527) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EGH/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 976) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Baker, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EGH/ENE, WAM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 40). |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami excused (5). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 583) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Ward. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-25 | House | Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation(Gov. Msg. No. 210). |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1030 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.