HI HB795 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of defense to conduct a vulnerability study that provides recommendations for areas in the State that should be protected by decorative bollards and submit a report to the legislature.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB795 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=795&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB795_.HTM |