HI HB794 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily places a cap on itemized deductions claimed on state income tax returns until January 1, 2016. Applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2010. Effective retroactive to January 1, 2011. (HB794 HD1)
Title
Itemized Deductions - Limits
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee on WAM has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-07-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 163). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Ching, Fontaine, Hashem, Marumoto, Nishimoto, Pine, Riviere, Thielen, Ward voting no (10) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Ward voting no (1) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Riviere; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |