HI HB782 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB782
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to improve the health care services related to cardiac care at Kona Community Hospital. Funds may be used for the construction of a hybrid catheterization lab and operating room and funding of cardiology staff positions to alleviate the lack of cardiac care. Permits the Department of Health to hire physicians to serve as district health officers. (HB782 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 729-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB782 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Cardiac Care
Department of Health
District Health Officers
Kona Community Hospital
Physicians
Cardiac Care
Department of Health
District Health Officers
Kona Community Hospital
Physicians