HI HB780 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a deputy attorney general, except for the Attorney General's First Deputy, to provide pro bono legal services at the discretion of the Attorney General. (HB780 HD1)
Title
Legal Services; Department of the Attorney General
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-08-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1010 (Same As) 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:15PM in conference room 325.