HI HB78 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB78
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for the Hawaii community college promise program to all qualified students. Appropriates funds to expand access to community college to qualified Hawaii residents through Hawaii community college promise program scholarships. Effective 6/30/3000.
Title
Relating To Strengthening Access To Higher Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
Rep. May Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Amato, Kong, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (4). |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-01-27 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 01-27-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB78 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Amato, Kong, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (4).
SB172 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB172 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=78&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB78_HD1_.HTM |