HI HB779 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB779
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture, in consultation with the department of health, to develop and implement a one-time pesticide disposal collection program, for a duration to be determined by the department. Requires the department of agriculture to convene a steering committee to guide and monitor the pesticide disposal collection program. Increases the administrative and criminal penalties for violating the Hawaii pesticides law. Appropriates moneys. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB719 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB779 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
HB779 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).