HI HB779 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB779
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from vaccination, revaccination, or immunization requirements of the Department of Health, any person who objects in writing to the requirements due to the person's philosophical beliefs. Replaces the Director of Health's discretion to overcome an individual's objection because of an epidemic with authority to order unvaccinated individuals to self-quarantine at home.
Title
Relating To Vaccines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB779 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=779&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB779_.HTM |