HI HB777 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB777
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes funds from the works of art special fund to be used for Bishop Museum and Iolani Palace. Sunsets 6/30/2022. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Works Of Art Special Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17). |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 663), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Har, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tam; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kapela; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB777 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.