HI HB776 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 595).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 595).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any party, including the State of Hawaii, to demand a jury trial in any action brought against the State under Chapter 662, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Government Tort Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 595). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 382). |
2013-03-27 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-25-13. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 8 offered. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-22-13. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 272). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 569) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Ito, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1006 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL.