HI HB761 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Places a moratorium on any new municipal solid waste landfill units on the leeward coast on or after 8/1/09.
Title
Waianae Coast Landfills; Moratorium
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLO on Thursday, 02-12-09 9:35 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to EEP/WLO, JUD, referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to EEP, WLO, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB701 (Same As) 2010-02-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=761&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB761_.HTM |