HI HB76 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an explicit grant of power of sale to condominium associations and planned community associations for the purposes of enforcing association liens under the power of sale procedures in state foreclosure law. (HB76 HD1)
Title
Relating To Nonjudicial Foreclosures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB76 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.