HI HB757 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB757
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a member of the Hawaiian Homes Commission and an additional public member to the board of directors of the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 260) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-05-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB757 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).