HI HB753 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 197, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 197, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes housing developed by the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands from school impact fees for 3 years. Allows construction cost component impact fees to be used to improve or renovate existing structures for school use. Repeals the prohibition against expending construction cost component impact fees for portable or temporary facilities. Repeals the requirement that an expenditure plan for all collected impact fees be incorporated into the Department of Education's annual budget process. (SD2)
Title
Relating To School Impact Fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Act 197, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 197, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325). |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nakamura, Branco Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 708) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1137) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 3:10PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HWN, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 247). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti, Matayoshi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 945), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |