HI HB753 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires department of human services, in consultation with the counties and any interested private homeless assistance programs, to develop temporary nighttime parking lots to provide safe overnight locations for homeless individuals who would otherwise sleep in their motor vehicles on public or private roads or property. (HB753 HD1)
Title
Homeless; Temporary Nighttime Shelter Parking Lots
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] |
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Carroll, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Pine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-09-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |